RI S0577 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-07 - Referred to House H.E.W.
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-07 - Referred to House H.E.W.
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides the office of the health insurance commissioner with oversight of risk-bearing provider organizations and health care risk contracts.
Title
Oversight Of Risk-bearing Provider Organizations
Sponsors
Sen. James Sheehan [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] |
Sen. Adam Satchell [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-06 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-07 | House | Referred to House H.E.W. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/06/2019) |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/30/2019) |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/21/2019) |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/23/2019) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |