RI S0578 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the rate of payment to licensed nursing facilities by the state to correspond with any increase in minimum wage as well as ensure that the rearray of the costs of the facility are performed as scheduled.
Title
Medical Assistance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/02/2019) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0578.pdf |