RI S0591 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes changes to the membership of the energy facilities siting board by increasing the size of the board from three (3) to seven (7) members for certain applications, and also imposes additional requirements on applicants for energy facilities.
Title
Energy Facility Siting Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-06 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/06/2019) |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Meeting postponed (05/30/2019) |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0591.pdf |