RI S0602 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes procedures for the Courts to establish non-monetary bail for pretrial release of detainees who are deemed eligible following an investigation and report submitted by the pretrial services unit utilizing the risk assessment tool.
Title
Bail And Recognizance
Sponsors
Sen. Sandra Cano [D] | Sen. Harold Metts [D] | Sen. Ana Quezada [D] | Sen. Elizabeth Crowley [D] |
Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/09/2019) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0602.pdf |