RI S0620 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifies the number of ounces a manufacturer of malt beverages is allowed to sell on their premises as twenty-four (24) twelve ounce (12 oz.) bottles or cans, or twenty-four (24) sixteen ounce (16 oz.) bottles or cans.
Title
Relating To Alcoholic Beverages
Sponsors
Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. James Seveney [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. William Conley [D] |
Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-28 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-28 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2019-06-27 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/28/2019) |
2019-06-27 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2019-06-25 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/27/2019) |
2019-06-25 | House | Committee transferred to House Small Business |
2019-05-01 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (04/30/2019) |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (04/24/2019) |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/27/2019) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |