RI S0623 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides regulations for the reselling of tickets for entertainment events including regulations for refunds, counterfeit ticket sales, delivery of tickets and deceptive ticket sales websites.
Title
Shows And Exhibitions
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] | Sen. James Seveney [D] | Sen. Melissa Murray [D] | Sen. Elizabeth Crowley [D] |
Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/24/2019) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0623.pdf |