RI S0633 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Joint Resolution Authorizing The Issuance Of Garvee Bonds

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Joint Resolution Authorizing The Issuance Of Garvee Bonds

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-14 - Senate - Passage (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15HouseReferred to House Finance
2019-05-14SenateSenate passed Sub A
2019-05-08SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (05/14/2019)
2019-05-07SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2019-05-06SenateProposed Substitute
2019-05-03SenateScheduled for consideration (05/07/2019)
2019-04-04SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-03-29SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2019)
2019-03-19SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Finance

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback