RI S0636 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits firearms possession within 300 feet of school grounds except for peace officers, retired law enforcement officers, persons providing school security, firearms on private property and unloaded firearms in containers or locked car racks.
Title
Weapons
Sponsors
Sen. Harold Metts [D] | Sen. Ana Quezada [D] | Sen. Elizabeth Crowley [D] | Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] |
Sen. Valarie Lawson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/02/2019) |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0636.pdf |