RI S0653 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes courses that include instruction in career and technical education programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School Committees And Superintendents

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18SenateSenate read and passed
2019-06-13SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/18/2019)
2019-06-12SenateCommittee recommends passage
2019-06-07SenateScheduled for consideration (06/12/2019)
2019-04-03SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-03-29SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/03/2019)
2019-03-21SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Education

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback