RI S0655 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires a school committee to demonstrate a good faith effort to meet the required number of days in the school year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School Committees And Superintendents

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-03-29SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/03/2019)
2019-03-21SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Education

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback