RI S0656 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the Rhode Island Early Childhood Innovation Act whereby the department of human services shall establish a childhood innovation fund to create programs to close the achievement gap that currently exists for at-risk children entering kindergarten.
Title
The Rhode Island Early Childhood Innovation Act
Sponsors
Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] | Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] | Sen. Ana Quezada [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] |
Sen. Harold Metts [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-05 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/05/2019) |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0656.pdf |