RI S0658 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Rhode Island global warming solutions act to reduce carbon emissions across various sectors of the local economy.
Title
Rhode Island Global Warming Solutions Act
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn Euer [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] |
Sen. William Conley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/01/2019) |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0658.pdf |