RI S0660 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Precludes Rhode Island local fishermen or aquaculturists from being found a public or private nuisance due to alleged objectionable odor or noise as a result of generally accepted industry procedures.
Title
Nuisance Actions Against Seafood And Commercial Fishing Industry
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] | Sen. Walter Felag [D] |
Sen. Mark McKenney [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/24/2019) |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0660.pdf |