RI S0664 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds department of corrections' correctional officers to the list of public safety employees that are entitled to their full salary if they are injured and become disabled as a result of performance of their job duties.
Title
Public Safety Employees
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] |
Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/11/2019) |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0664.pdf |