RI S0668 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - Committee recommends passage
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides a tax credit for qualified investments in "opportunity zones" as defined by federal law and located in Rhode Island.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rhode Island Opportunity Zone Tax Credit And Tax Exemption Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18SenateCommittee recommends passage
2019-06-14SenateScheduled for consideration (06/18/2019)
2019-06-11SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-06-07SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/11/2019)
2019-03-21SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Finance

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback