RI S0669 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-21 - Committee heard and continued
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-21 - Committee heard and continued
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the city of Newport to impose an additional two percent (2%) real estate transfer tax.
Title
Real Estate Conveyance Tax
Sponsors
Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | Senate | Committee heard and continued |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/21/2019) |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0669.pdf |