RI S0671 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes a Pawtucket-Central Falls station redevelopment district and provides that tax credits may be available for certain projects located in the district for an amount not to exceed 50% of the project cost.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rebuild Rhode Island Tax Credit

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-28SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-05-24SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/28/2019)
2019-03-21SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Finance

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback