RI S0673 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes state and local incremental tax revenues generated in the arts district, the growth center district and the ballpark district in the city of Pawtucket to be allocated to finance improvements in the districts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Redevelopment Agencies And Projects

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-28 - House - Passage in concurrence passage of amendment (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-28 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 53 N: 9 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-28 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Redevelopment agencies/projects approval of amendment (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-08HouseSigned by Governor
2019-07-02HouseTransmitted to Governor
2019-06-28SenateSenate passed as amended in concurrence
2019-06-28SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/28/2019)
2019-06-28HouseHouse passed as amended (floor amendment)
2019-06-28HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/28/2019)
2019-06-27SenateSenate passed as amended (floor amendment)
2019-06-27SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/27/2019)
2019-06-18SenateCommittee recommends passage
2019-06-14SenateScheduled for consideration (06/18/2019)
2019-06-06SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-05-31SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/06/2019)
2019-03-21SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Finance

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback