RI S0675 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-14 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-14 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Relating To Debt Management Act (authorizes Approval Of $50,000,000 Rhode Island Turnpike And Bridge Authority Revenue Bonds Secured By Toll, Transfers Of Motor Fuel Taxes And Other Revenues To Provide Funds To Maintain And Improve Certain Bridges And Projects.)
Title
Joint Resolution Relating To Debt Management Act (authorizes Approval Of $50,000,000 Rhode Island Turnpike And Bridge Authority Revenue Bonds Secured By Toll, Transfers Of Motor Fuel Taxes And Other Revenues To Provide Funds To Maintain And Improve Certain Bridges And Projects.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/13/2019) |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/11/2019) |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/21/2019) |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |