RI S0691 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Expands the definition of "family member" for purposes of zoning ordinances.
Title
Zoning Ordinances
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-27 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-27 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2019-06-26 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/27/2019) |
2019-06-24 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2019-06-24 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/26/2019) |
2019-06-24 | House | Placed on House Calendar |
2019-06-21 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/24/2019) |
2019-05-03 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/02/2019) |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (04/25/2019) |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2019) |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |