RI S0692 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Housing and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Housing and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the number of members of the transit authority from eight to nine and makes the mayor of Providence or designee an ex officio member with voting privileges.
Title
Rhode Island Public Transit Authority
Sponsors
Sen. Harold Metts [D] | Sen. Ana Quezada [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Samuel Bell [D] |
Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2019) |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0692.pdf |