RI S0702 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-14 - Committee transferred to House H.E.W.
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-14 - Committee transferred to House H.E.W.
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Precludes the disability of a parent from serving as a basis for denial or restriction in matters involving a child's welfare, foster care, family law, guardianship and adoption.
Title
Preservation Of Families With Disabled Parent Act
Sponsors
Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. William Conley [D] | Sen. James Seveney [D] |
Sen. Dawn Euer [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | House | Committee transferred to House H.E.W. |
2019-06-14 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/13/2019) |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/11/2019) |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Meeting postponed (05/28/2019) |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/11/2019) |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |