RI S0710 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that fifty dollars ($50.00) of the filing fee paid to the HUD-approved agency for the mediation conference involving the mortgagee and mortgagor, shall be paid to the Rhode Island Legal Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mortgage Foreclosure And Sale

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-26 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-27HouseReferred to House Finance
2019-06-26SenateSenate passed Sub A
2019-06-25SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/26/2019)
2019-06-20SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2019-06-19SenateProposed Substitute
2019-06-17SenateScheduled for consideration (06/20/2019)
2019-03-28SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-03-22SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2019)
2019-03-21SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Judiciary

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback