RI S0711 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides persons under limited guardianship, guardianship conservatorship with rights designed to protect them from mental, physical and financial abuse by guardians and conservators retroactively and prospectively.
Title
Limited Guardianship And Guardianship Of Adults
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] |
Sen. William Conley [D] | Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-28 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2017-07-18 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-28 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2017-06-28 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/28/2017) |
2017-06-27 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2017-06-24 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/27/2017) |
2017-06-24 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/22/2017) |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/20/2017) |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/27/2017) |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |