RI S0711 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Senate Resolution Respectfully Requesting The Governor's Workforce Board To Work With The Rhode Island Department Of Labor And Training To Develop A Report On The Feasibility Of Expanding Non-trade Registered Apprenticeship Programs In Rhode Island

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Senate Resolution Respectfully Requesting The Governor's Workforce Board To Work With The Rhode Island Department Of Labor And Training To Develop A Report On The Feasibility Of Expanding Non-trade Registered Apprenticeship Programs In Rhode Island

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-01 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01SenateSenate read and passed
2019-04-25SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (05/01/2019)
2019-04-24SenateCommittee recommends passage
2019-04-19SenateScheduled for consideration (04/24/2019)
2019-04-03SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-03-29SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/03/2019)
2019-03-21SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Labor

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback