RI S0715 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-22 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-22 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the date that a new, fully reflective registration plate would be issued from January 1, 2020 to December 1, 2019. The act would also increase the registration fee for fully reflective plates from $6.00 to fifteen dollars $15.00.
Title
Registration Of Vehicles -- Registration Fees
Sponsors
Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Dominick Ruggerio [D] | Sen. William Conley [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] |
Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Passage (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-22 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/21/2019) |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/15/2019) |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/10/2019) |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |