RI S0719 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-21 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-21 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Adds elementary or secondary school mathematics, world languages or science educators to those individuals eligible for a fellowship.
Title
Stay Invested In Ri Wavemaker Fellowship
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] | Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Adam Satchell [D] |
Sen. James Seveney [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-21 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/20/2019) |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2019-06-14 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/18/2019) |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/28/2019) |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |