RI S0741 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Names the intersection of Hartford and Reservoir Avenue in the town of Johnston as "The Bernard Frezza, Jr. Corner."
Title
Permanent Joint Committee On Naming All New Buildings, Bridges, Edifices And Other State Constructions
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] | Sen. Dominick Ruggerio [D] | Sen. William Conley [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] |
Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-25 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - Passage in concurrence passage of amendment (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - Passage in concurrence as amended (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - Passage in concurrence passage of amendment (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - Passage in concurrence as amended (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | House | Signed by Governor |
2019-06-25 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Senate passed as amended in concurrence |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/25/2019) |
2019-06-19 | House | House passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2019-06-17 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/19/2019) |
2019-06-13 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2019-06-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/13/2019) |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to House Special Legislation |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (04/10/2019) |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/03/2019) |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |