RI S0751 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Housing and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Housing and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that notices of amendments to zoning ordinances be sent first class mail. A quorum of the zoning board of review shall be a majority of the authorized members to vote, including alternates.
Title
Local Planning Board Or Commission--zoning Ordinances
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/11/2019) |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0751.pdf |