RI S0753 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Adds virtual currency to the existing electronic money transmission and sale of check licenses and adds additional regulatory provisions to simplify and clarify licensing related thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Licensed Activities--currency Transmissions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-28 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Currency transmissions approval of amendment (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-15SenateSigned by Governor
2019-07-11SenateTransmitted to Governor
2019-06-28HouseHouse passed Sub A as amended in concurrence
2019-06-26HousePlaced on the House Consent Calendar (06/28/2019)
2019-06-26HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A as amended in concurrence
2019-06-24HouseScheduled for consideration (06/26/2019)
2019-06-21HouseReferred to House Corporations
2019-06-20SenateSenate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment)
2019-06-18SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/20/2019)
2019-06-18SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2019-06-17SenateProposed Substitute
2019-06-14SenateScheduled for consideration (06/18/2019)
2019-04-23SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-04-19SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/23/2019)
2019-04-04SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Commerce

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback