RI S0755 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-16 - Meeting postponed (06/18/2013)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-16 - Meeting postponed (06/18/2013)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Insurance -- Self-insurance Of Developmental Disability Agencies
Title
An Act Relating To Insurance -- Self-insurance Of Developmental Disability Agencies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-16 | House | Meeting postponed (06/18/2013) |
2013-06-14 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2013-05-21 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/16/2013) |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/09/2013) |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2013) |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |