RI S0756 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prevents the energy facility siting board from proceeding to final hearing or issuing a final decision if one or more of the designated agencies inform the siting board that they are unable to form an advisory opinion due the conduct of the applicant.
Title
Energy Facility Siting Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-13 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/13/2017) |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/SenateText17/S0756.pdf |