RI S0759 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Grants solar energy system retail purchasers protections requiring disclosures in the retail/lease documents the right to cancel/rescind agreement within 90 days prior to installation/notice of liens filed on their property.
Title
Residential Solar Energy - Disclosure And Homeowners Bill Of Rights Act
Sponsors
Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. William Conley [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] |
Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/01/2019) |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0759.pdf |