RI S0760 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-26 - Referred to House Corporations
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-26 - Referred to House Corporations
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Adds a definition for "other eligible entity" and includes the entity under the provisions of the net metering statute and amends the definition for multi-municipal collaborative to be called multi-party collaborative.
Title
Net Metering
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-25 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-26 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/25/2019) |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2019-06-14 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/19/2019) |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/01/2019) |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |