RI S0777 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends certain campaign contribution and expenditure reporting requirements and would provide for forfeiture of campaign contributions upon a conviction or plea of nolo contendere to specified felony crimes relating to public office.
Title
Elections -- Nomination Of Party And Independent Candidates; Rhode Island Campaign Contributions And Expenditures Reporting; Criminal Offenses -- Theft, Embezzlement, False Pretenses, And Misappropriations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/28/2019) |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0777.pdf |