RI S0780 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-27 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-27 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminates the marital sexual assault exception when a victim is incapacitated, disabled, or helpless.
Title
Sexual Assault
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn Euer [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] | Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] | Sen. Valarie Lawson [D] |
Sen. Melissa Murray [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-26 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-27 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/26/2019) |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/25/2019) |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/11/2019) |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |