RI S0784 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permits those other residents of a residential dwelling unit to extend the term of the rental agreement for a period not to exceed three (3) months after the death of the lessee.
Title
Residential Landlord And Tenant Act
Sponsors
Sen. Samuel Bell [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] | Sen. Melissa Murray [D] | Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] |
Sen. Ana Quezada [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/23/2019) |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0784.pdf |