RI S0789 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-07 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-07 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals current state law regarding paternity and replaces it with a more comprehensive parentage act that provides procedures establishing parentage, genetic testing, surrogacy agreements and assisted reproduction.
Title
Rhode Island Parentage Act
Sponsors
Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] |
Sen. Dawn Euer [D] | Sen. Melissa Murray [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-06 - Senate - Rhode island parentage act approval of amendment (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-07 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Senate passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/06/2019) |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/30/2019) |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2019) |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |