RI S0790 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 1 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-24 - Committee recommends passage
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 1 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-24 - Committee recommends passage
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires purchaser of tax sale property, not the redeeming party, to pay collector's deed recording fee with reimbursement by any redeeming party, if any.
Title
Tax Sales
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-24 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/25/2015) |
2015-06-22 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/24/2015) |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/26/2015) |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/SenateText15/S0790.pdf |