RI S0804 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Senate Resolution Celebrating The 35th Anniversary Of The Enthronement Of His Eminence Metropolitan Methodios On April 8, 1984

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Senate Resolution Celebrating The 35th Anniversary Of The Enthronement Of His Eminence Metropolitan Methodios On April 8, 1984

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24SenateSenate read and passed
2019-04-23SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (04/24/2019)

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback