RI S0811 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows Keith A. Lewis to join Erica Mary Felins and Justin Moffitt Lewis in marriage on or about June 22, 2019, within the Town of New Shoreham, Rhode Island.
Title
Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-05-21 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (05/21/2019) |
2019-05-16 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2019-05-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/16/2019) |
2019-05-03 | House | Referred to House Special Legislation |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (05/02/2019) |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/30/2019) |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |