RI S0816 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Health And Safety - Biodiesel Heating Oil Act Of 2013 (would Enact The Biodiesel Heating Oil Act Of 2013, Which Would Require That All Heating Oil Sold In The State Contain Five Percent (5%) Of A Biobased Product.)
Title
An Act Relating To Health And Safety - Biodiesel Heating Oil Act Of 2013 (would Enact The Biodiesel Heating Oil Act Of 2013, Which Would Require That All Heating Oil Sold In The State Contain Five Percent (5%) Of A Biobased Product.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-11 | House | Signed by Governor |
2013-07-05 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (07/01/2013) |
2013-06-27 | House | House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2013-06-18 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/27/2013) |
2013-05-30 | House | Referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/29/2013) |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/22/2013) |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/08/2013) |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |