RI S0816 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for changes to the veterans' services strategic plan advisory committee to provide coordination of state, federal, and private veterans' services.
Title
Veterans' Affairs
Sponsors
Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. James Seveney [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] |
Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-27 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-05 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-27 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2017-06-24 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/27/2017) |
2017-06-20 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2017-06-16 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/20/2017) |
2017-05-18 | House | Referred to House Veterans Affairs |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/17/2017) |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/10/2017) |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |