RI S0816 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes office of adult education literarcy/employment advisory committee within GWBRI for adult education and literacy services/repeals adult education act and aid for evening schools eff. 12/1/19.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adult Education

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-19HouseReferred to House Finance
2019-06-18SenateSenate passed Sub A
2019-06-13SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/18/2019)
2019-06-12SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2019-06-11SenateProposed Substitute
2019-06-07SenateScheduled for consideration (06/12/2019)
2019-05-29SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-05-24SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/29/2019)
2019-04-30SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Education

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback