RI S0817 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends the expiration dates pertaining to approvals and permits and would apply to approvals and permits in effect on November 9, 2009 and those issued between November 9, 2009 and June 30, 2016, but would not revive any expired approval or permit.
Title
Department Of Environmental Management
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-17 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2015-06-17 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2015-06-13 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/17/2015) |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/04/2015) |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/27/2015) |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |