RI S0817 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Placed on Senate Calendar (06/25/2019)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes a licensed physical therapist to perform physical therapy services to a student while in school without a prescription or referral, in accordance with the student's IEP or IFSP.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Physical Therapists

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-21SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/25/2019)
2019-06-12SenateCommittee recommends passage
2019-06-07SenateScheduled for consideration (06/12/2019)
2019-05-29SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-05-24SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/29/2019)
2019-04-30SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Education

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback