RI S0823 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the town of East Greenwich to adopt a flexible tiered tax classification system regardless of whether it is a revaluation or update year and also to provide an exemption to small businesses for tangible personal property taxes.
Title
Levy And Assessment Of Local Taxes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-06 - House - Passage *************************** (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Levy & assessment of local taxes approval of amendment (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Levy & assessment of local taxes approval of amendment (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-07 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-06 | House | House passed as amended in concurrence |
2019-06-06 | House | Recommended for Immediate Consideration |
2019-06-05 | House | Referred to House Municipal Government |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Senate passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/04/2019) |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/09/2019) |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |