RI S0824 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removes the prohibition on state appropriations to the municipal infrastructure grant program, and would provide for a one time $10,000,000 appropriation to administer the program.
Title
The Rhode Island Municipal Infrastructure Grant Program
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] | Sen. Adam Satchell [D] | Sen. James Seveney [D] | Sen. Sandra Cano [D] |
Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/28/2019) |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0824.pdf |