RI S0828 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
PLAT 90 LOT 23) AND TO ISSUE NOT MORE THAN $7,500,000 BONDS AND NOTES THEREFOR (Authorizes the town of North Kingstown to issue not more than seven million five hundred dollars ($7,500,000) in bonds and notes to finance improvements and/or related equipment for the town hall.
Title
Authorizing The Town Of North Kingstown To Finance Construction, Renovations, Demolition, Remediation, Alterations, Additions And Other Improvements And/or Related Equipment For The Town Hall At 80 Boston Neck Road And At Memorial Park
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-02 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-19 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2019-06-14 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/19/2019) |
2019-06-13 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2019-06-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/13/2019) |
2019-06-10 | House | Meeting postponed (06/11/2019) |
2019-06-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2019-05-31 | House | Committee transferred to House Municipal Government |
2019-05-24 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/23/2019) |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/16/2019) |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |