RI S0829 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Senate passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Senate Resolution Denouncing And Opposing White Nationalist And Neo-nazi Groups

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Senate Resolution Denouncing And Opposing White Nationalist And Neo-nazi Groups

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-05SenateSenate passed Sub A
2019-06-04SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/05/2019)
2019-05-30SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2019-05-29SenateProposed Substitute
2019-05-23SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/30/2019)
2019-04-30SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Judiciary

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback